judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSE M. HULL v. MICHAEL D'ARCY, DEBRA ANN D'ARCY, and JACK DALTON

Case Heading (S-08-0058)
Case Number:S-08-0058Case Docketed On:03/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:ROSE M. HULL v. MICHAEL D'ARCY, DEBRA ANN D'ARCY, and JACK DALTON
Full Title:ROSE M. HULL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MICHAEL D'ARCY, DEBRA ANN D'ARCY, and JACK DALTON, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRose M. HullFrank J. Jones
AppelleeMichael D'ArcyJack John C. Hoard
AppelleeDebra Ann D'ArcyJack John C. Hoard
AppelleeJack DaltonJack John C. Hoard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Property - Real, Taxation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 30
Citation:202 P.3d 417

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/11/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
03/13/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/17/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/17/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/05/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/12/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/12/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/10/2008Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellee regarding electronically filing of brief. He was not aware of requirement, is delivering paper to court today, and will take training course. Per CJ, he will be allowed 3 days to electronically file.EventPhone CallFinal
07/10/2008Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellees; driving brief down and developed car problems. Per CJ, will be treated as any other untimely brief if not received before 5:00 p.m. Advised counsel he could file a motion to consider a late filed briefEventPhone CallFinal
07/11/2008Brief - Appellees and received copy of designation of record on appeal (untimely filed)BriefAppelleeFinal
07/15/2008Motion - Accept late filingMotionAccept late filingFinal
07/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - appellees' motion to accept untimely filed brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2008Order - Other - Granting appellees' motion to accept untimely brief.OrderOtherFinal
07/25/2008Brief - Appellee (per order, electronic brief accepted this date).BriefAppelleeFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/01/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/14/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/05/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/23/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/23/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed fror 3/26/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal