judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARY J. MUELLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0057)
Case Number:S-08-0057Case Docketed On:03/10/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MARY J. MUELLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARY J. MUELLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMary J. MuellerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Search Warrant
Opinion Number:2009 WY 27
Citation:202 P.3d 404

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/10/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/02/2008Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk. Judge set hearing regarding appeal bond and asked her about jurisdiction. Referred her to Wyo. R. App. P. 6.01.EventPhone CallFinal
04/28/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/28/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2008Event - Rejected Filing - motion to supplement the record. Contacted counsel and advised that it can be taken care of in District Court pursuant to W.R.A.P. Rule 3.04.EventRejected FilingFinal
06/11/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received and copy of brief on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/01/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/26/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/16/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/18/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal