judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. FREESE

Case Information: 33274
Short Caption:STATE VS. FREESECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35930 , 37793 , 41092
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138955Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/05/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/05/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
11/18/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
11/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Guilty plea--5/20/97. To Court Reporter: Diann Prock.
11/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Arraignment--11/5/96; Negotiations --5/15/97. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer.
11/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Sentencing--10/19/97; Hearing on Petition--10/14/98. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
11/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Possible Negotiations--5/13/97. To Court Reporter: Joanie Grime.
12/17/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 14, 1998. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
03/08/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
03/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
04/12/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/8/99.
05/10/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Filed Motion to Expedite Appeal.
12/21/1999Other Other. Filed Order oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
12/21/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs to the Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/23/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to Clark County Clerk requesting pre-sentence investigation report. (Transmitted via fax and regular mail.)
02/28/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. ORIGINAL presentence-investigation report. 00-02903
03/13/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." fn1[The plea was entered before the Honorable Stephen Huffaker. Due to a general reassignment of criminal cases, the Honorable Michael L. Douglas heard the petition.] fn3[Appellant's pending motion to expedite appeal is denied as moot.] Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Becker, J. We concur: Maupin, J. and Shearing, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03874
03/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Staying Remittitur and Referring Appeal to En Banc Court for Reconsideration. On March 13, 2000, the Southern Nevada Panel of this court issued an opinion in the appeal reversing an order of the district court granting a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Three members of this court have requested that the panel's decision be reconsidered by the full court. This matter is hereby referred to the en banc court for reconsideration. The clerk of this court shall stay the issuance of the remittitur pending further order of this court. 00-04978
12/04/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Opinion on Reconsideration. "Reversed and remanded." fn1[We issue this opinion in place of the prior panel opinion of March 13, 2000. See State v. Freese, 116 Nev. ___, 997 P.2d 122 (2000).] Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Becker, J. We concur: Young, J., Maupin, J., and Shearing, J. Agosti, J., with whom Rose, C.J., and Leavitt, J., agree, dissenting. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 115. En Banc. 00-21076
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21247
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21247