judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TANYA ANITA BEVERLY V. HARRIET TUBMAN CENTER

Case Information: 10-AA-1222
Short Caption:TANYA ANITA BEVERLY V. HARRIET TUBMAN CENTERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Human Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHS00231-10Filed Date:10/04/2010

Opening Event Date:10/04/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTanya Anita Beverly YPro SeN
RespondentHarriet Tubman CenterNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/04/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
10/04/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/13/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to October 4, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
10/13/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
11/19/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 13, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
09/09/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 7/7/10 hearing
09/09/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/07/2011FiledReceived from post office order mailed to petitioner marked " return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward). Order remailed. (Petitioner)
10/27/2011FiledReceived from post office order mailed to petitioner marked " return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". Sent to file room. (Petitioner)
11/02/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/02/2011FiledDismissed
11/28/2011FiledMandate
12/02/2011FiledReceived order returned from post office. sent to file room. (Petitioner)