judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION v. KEITH JEROME THOMASON

Case Heading (S-08-0056)
Case Number:S-08-0056Case Docketed On:03/10/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION v. KEITH JEROME THOMASON
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION, Appellant (Respondent), v. KEITH JEROME THOMASON, Appellee (Petitioner),

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAttorney General's Office - Criminal Investigation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath
AppelleeKeith Jerome ThomasonDion James Custis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Statutes
Opinion Number:2008 WY 143
Citation:197 P.3d 144

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/10/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/10/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/08/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2008Brief - Other - copy of appellant's brief on diskBriefOtherFinal
05/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/06/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/17/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/30/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/29/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal