judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

KATIE HODGE, ET VIR v. MANATHIS HICKS, ET AL.

Case: A-2723
A-2723
05/23/1950
Application for Writ of Error
KATIE HODGE, ET VIR
MANATHIS HICKS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/30/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/23/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/25/1950Opinion issued
06/30/1950Response to Petition
06/21/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/21/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/23/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Manathis Hicks, et al.Respondent
Katie Hodge, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information