judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEWART VS. STEWART

Case Information: 33006
Short Caption:STEWART VS. STEWARTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 28035Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/11/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/11/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 (Matthew J. Stermitz- Check no. 6015).
09/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
09/18/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and Preparation of Transcripts suspended pending further order of this court).
09/23/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of No Transcript Request.
09/25/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/01/1998Other Other. Returned unfiled with letter: original and two copies of Appellant's Opening Brief and original Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief. Notice of Settlement Conference issued on 9/18/98, suspends briefing and preparation of transcripts pending further order of this court.
11/16/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction to consider her appeal. We caution appellant that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of her appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in ths appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
12/31/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order Dated the 4th of December, 1998.
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. Ross P. Eardley withdraws as counsel for respondent.
02/19/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Modification of Caption. (Modified caption to correct first name of respondent.)
03/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order having reviewed appellant's response to our order, we have jurisdiction to consider this appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. In light of attorney Ross P. Eardley's withdrawal as respondent's counsel, respondent shall have 30 days from this order to retain new counsel and to enter new counsel's appearance with this court. Respondent shall then have 20 days from service of the opening brief or the entry of new counsel's appearance, whichever date is later, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall then have10 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve any reply brief. If respondent fails to retain counsel, this appeal shall stand submitted on appellant's opening brief and appendix.
04/02/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 3/31/99).
04/02/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance. Lisa K. Mendez hereby enters her appearance as counsel for the Respondent, Robert Alvin Stewart.
05/03/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered-Reno/Carson Messenger 5/3/99.
05/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. Mailed on: Hand delivered-Reno/Carson Messenger 5/3/99.
10/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, December 13, 1999 at the hour of 11:30 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP-CY, DA, ML).
11/12/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reset Oral Argument.
11/18/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion to reset.
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order respondent has filed a motion to reset oral argument. The motion is opposed. We grant appellant's motion. The argument currently scheduled herein for December 13, 1999 at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. The clerk shall reschedule oral argument for the Northern Panel's first available argument calendar after January 3, 2000.
12/23/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral argument is scheduled for February 14, 2000, at the hour of 11:00 a.m. - 1/2 hr. in Carson City, NNP99B- CY, DA, ML.
01/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Continuation.
01/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Review of Motion for Continuation/Reset.
01/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Rescheduling. We grant the motion to reschedule oral argument. We vacate the argument currently scheduled for: February 14, 2000. To be rescheduled on April 2000 NNP argument calendar for 30 minutes.
02/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for April 11, 2000, at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP99B-CY/DA/ML) 00-03065
03/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-05098
04/11/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. Appellant's counsel Mr. Stermitz failed to appear; argument heard on behalf of respondent only. NRAP 34. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
05/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08718
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10282
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/30/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 22, 2000. 00-10282