judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRETT ALAN CRAMER v. POWDER RIVER COAL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, f/k/a Powder River Coal Company, a Delaware Corporation, and CABALLO COAL COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives

Case Heading (S-08-0049)
Case Number:S-08-0049Case Docketed On:03/04/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:BRETT ALAN CRAMER v. POWDER RIVER COAL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, f/k/a Powder River Coal Company, a Delaware Corporation, and CABALLO COAL COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives
Full Title:BRETT ALAN CRAMER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. POWDER RIVER COAL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, f/k/a Powder River Coal Company, a Delaware Corporation, and CABALLO COAL COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrett Alan CramerC. John Cotton
AppelleePowder River Coal CompanyRichard Alan Mincer
Billie LM Addleman
AppelleeCaballo Coal Company, a Delaware CorporationRichard Alan Mincer
Billie LM Addleman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Negligence, Trial - Damages, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2009 WY 45
Citation:204 P.3d 974

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/04/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/05/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy brief on cd.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/23/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for appelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, nine volumes (2 boxes). Volumes I-VII, Original Papers; Volume VIII, Transcripts; Volume IX, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Mincer and Billie Addleman for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C. John Cotton for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (C. John Cotton for appellant and Billie L.M. Addleman and Richard Alan Mincer for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/31/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/14/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
04/14/2009Brief - Appellant In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefAppellantFinal
04/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of PetitionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal