judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SERBENNIA ANISHA CHASE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1214
Short Caption:SERBENNIA ANISHA CHASE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:10-CF-1214Consolidated: 10-CF-1215
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-21035-08Filed Date:09/27/2010

Opening Event Date:09/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSerbennia A. Chase YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/13/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeals andit appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Judith Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal nos. 10-CF-1214 and 10-CF-1215. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/13/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Judith Lovelace, Esquire
10/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (32 pgs/Pirfo) 6/14/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (153 pgs/Pirfo) 6/15/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (153-337 pgs/Pirfo) 6/16/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (338-518 pgs/Pirfo) 6/17/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (103 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/21/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (45 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/22/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (35 pgs/tape) 8/31/10 proc. w/cd
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1214)
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1214)
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1215)
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1215)
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (pretrail sevs report--- SEALED)
12/17/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (ex parte motions & med records SEALED)
01/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/29/11. no oppo
02/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 29, 2011. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/6/11. no oppo
05/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/13/11. no oppo
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/26/11 no oppo
05/26/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
06/02/2011ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant and the limited appendix. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/02/2011APPENDIX
06/30/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to August 4, 2011 (no oppo).
07/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellee's motion for leave to supplement
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extension
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (J&C/probation order-Judge Milliken filed 10/23/07)
08/04/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/04/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/06/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
01/17/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
01/17/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/25/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Pryor
04/04/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
04/09/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/26/2012FiledMandate