judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WENDELL JACKSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0048)
Case Number:S-08-0048Case Docketed On:03/04/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:WENDELL JACKSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WENDELL JACKSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWendell JacksonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Kristin Shaun Wilkerson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2009 WY 82
Citation:209 P.3d 897 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2008Brief - Appellant (Notice: The file stamp on this e-filed document is incorrect due to a problem with a system update. It bears the Montana Supreme Court watermark. The original has been filed with the Clerk of the Wyoming Supreme Court)BriefAppellantFinal
04/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received- brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/18/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papersl Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to warden at the Wyoming State Penitentiary signed for 6/22/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for 7/8/09 by agent for Warden.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal