judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO JAMIL

Case Information: 32436
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO JAMILCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):39011
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D213951Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/20/2000 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/20/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jimmerson, Davis & Hansen - Check no. 12854.
06/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
06/12/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.
10/01/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.
11/02/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper.
11/05/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Enlargement of Time and to set Briefing Schedule.
11/09/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Vols. I and II pages 1 thru 468. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper.
11/20/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Firm change of Address
02/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 2, 1998, the court reporter, Deborah S. Casper, filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the transcripts. 1[The court reporter filed the requested transcripts on November 9, 1998. We deny her motion as moot.] On November 5, 1998, appellants filed a motion for an enlargement of time and to set a briefing schedule. Their motion for enlargement of time and to set briefing schedule is denied. Appellants shall, within 20 days of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter briefing shall strictly comply with NRAP 31(a)(2). Failure to comply with this order or any of the rules of appellate procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions.
03/12/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/11/99.
03/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/11/99.
03/15/1999Other Other. Filed Receipt of Copy (Appellant's Opening Brief, Vols. 1 and 2).
03/18/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 6, 1998 To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.
04/02/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Jamil). Mailed on: Fed-Ex 4/1/99.
04/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
04/13/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed April 9, 1999, is granted. The reply brief shall be served and filed on or before April 23, 1999.
04/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 6, 1998 Court Reporter: Deborah Casper
04/26/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 4/23/99
11/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Scheduled for January 20, 2000, at the hour of 1:00 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (NNP99B - CY, DA, ML).
12/01/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. (Received only per SJ)
01/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 1, 1999, appellants submitted a first supplemental appendix to the opening brief. We grant the unopposed request and direct the clerk to file the supplemental appendix provisionally received on December 1, 1999. We express no opinion as to the contents of the appendix itself.
01/07/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. First Supplemental Appendix.
01/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP99B - CY, DA, ML
08/24/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Agosti, J. We concur: Rose, C.J., Young, J., Maupin, J., Shearing, J., Leavitt, J., Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. En Banc. 00-14841
09/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14911
09/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-14911