judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN A. JONES V. RAFAEL LOPEZ

Case Information: 10-CV-1204
Short Caption:MELVIN A. JONES V. RAFAEL LOPEZClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB233-09Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/08/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin A. JonesYPro SeN
AppelleeRafael LopezNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 20, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
10/12/2010RECEIVED- aplt motion for appeal transcripts (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 9/13/10, 9/14/10 & 9/15/10) (elp)
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (41-pgs/tape 2/23/10 proc.)
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (59-pgs/tape 4/19/10 proc.)
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (53-pgs/tape wood 9/13/10 proc.)w/cd
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (256-pgs/ramos 9/13-15/10 proc.)
12/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/13/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for appointment of amicus curiae
01/14/2011TMC - appellant's motion for appointment of counsel
02/01/2011On consideration of appellant's motion for the appointment of an amicus curiae, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is denied. It is FO that appellant's brief and limited appendix remains due on or before Feb 14, 2011. (RZFIKG)
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix
02/03/2011APPENDIX
03/11/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix were filed with this court on February 3, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before March 10, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
04/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 11, 2011, which directed appellee to submit his brief within 15 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the brief has not yet been filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be schedule for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) elp
04/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
06/14/2011LETTER - from aplt re: case on appeal
08/30/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Construing Appellant's Motion for leave to Supplement the Record as a D.C. App. R. 28 (k) statement
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Leave - to supplement the record with attachments (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/07/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Aplt)
10/14/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion for oral argument.
11/08/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Reid
03/16/2012FiledLetter From appellant re: case on appeal (Appellant)
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Reid, Senior Judge)
08/21/2012FiledMandate
09/10/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)