judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ VS. RODRIGUEZ

Case Information: 30223
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ VS. RODRIGUEZCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37900
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D180435Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:04/09/1997 / White, EarleSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/15/2000 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/15/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/04/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
04/07/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
04/08/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
04/09/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Earle W. White. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/14/1997Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Received a letter from attorney Myers. Re: filing fee. Appellant has completed an Application to proceed in Forma Pauperis. As soon as the Order is signed the Supreme Court will be served with a copy.
04/16/1997Other Other. Returned, unfiled, Case Appeal Statement. (Not filed or certified in the district court.)
04/21/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/28/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of the Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court on April 15, 1997.
06/04/1997Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Filed Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
08/18/1997BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
08/18/1997AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
08/21/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Settlement Judge Earle W. White, Jr., has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The clerk shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix thereto received on August 18, 1997. The parties are directed to adhere to the following briefing schedule. Respondent shall file the answering brief within 20 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall have 10 days from service of the answering brief to file the reply brief. Extensions of this briefing schedule will be granted only by court order. We direct the clerk to schedule this appeal for oral argument in November, 1997, or as soon thereafter as possible: 30 minutes.
08/21/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 8/15/97 - FedEx).
08/21/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. (Mailed on: 8/15/97 - FedEx).
09/05/1997MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Record for Respondent.
09/22/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant attorney Ochoa's motion to withdraw. The clerk shall forthwith remove attorney Ochoa as respondent's counsel of record on this court's docket. Attorney Ochoa shall have 15 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on respondent and file proof of such service in this court. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter an appearance in this court and shall also cause new counsel to file an answering brief within 60 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a) (2). Should respondent fail to obtain new counsel in this appeal and to cause counsel to comply with this order the above-specified time periods, this appeal shall stand submitted on the opening brief, appellant's appendix and other papers filed herein. We vacate that portion of our order on August 21, 1997, which set forth a briefing schedule and directed the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument in November, 1997.
10/03/1997Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order by: Vincent Ochoa, Esq.
05/04/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from attorney Andrew S. Myers. He will be closing his law practice in Nevada on May 22, 1998, but will continue to represent appellant.
05/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. To date, respondent has failed to comply with our order of September 22, 1997. Cause appearing, and consistent with this court's September 22, 1997, order, this matter shall stand submitted as of the date of this order on the opening brief, appellant's appendix and other papers filed herein.
06/19/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reopen the Briefing Schedule to Permit Filing of an Answering Brief and pemit the Preparation of the Trial Transcript.
07/06/1998Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Filed Cetificate of Service.
07/07/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Late Filing of Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reopen Briefing Schedule.
07/20/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Late Filing of Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reopen Briefing Schedule.
09/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On July 7, 1998, appellant filed a motion to file a late opposition to respondent's motion. On July 20, 1998, respondent filed an opposition thereto. We grant appellant's motion. The clerk shall file the opposition submitted with appellant's motion forthwith. We grant respondent's motion to file an answering brief and to permit the preparation of the trial transcript. We hereby vacate our May 7, 1998, order submitting this appeal for decision based upon the opening brief, appellant's appendix and other filed papers. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form requesting the court reporter to prepare the trial transcript. Respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a) (1).
09/22/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reopen Briefing Schedule.
11/19/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of Time to Prepare Transcripts.
12/11/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On November 19, 1998, court transcriber Deborah S. Casper filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the transcript. We deny as moot transciber Casper's motion for an extension of time. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the transcript request form. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions.
12/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Date of Proceeding: January 26, 1996. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper.
01/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcript dated January 26, 1996.
01/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings: 01/26/96. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. (Mailed on: 01/07/99).
01/27/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Change of Address Notification from attorney Andrew S. Myers. (Effective 3/1/99.)
04/07/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend time Within Which the Respondent's Answering Brief is Due.
04/07/1999BriefReceived Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 04/05/99).
04/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On April 7, 1999, respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. In the interest of judicial economy we grant respondent's unopposed motion. The clerk shall forthwith file the answering brief provisionally submitted with the motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file a reply brief.
04/22/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief.
04/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix.
05/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief (mailed on 5/24/99).
05/28/1999Other Other. Filed Errata To Appellant's Reply Brief.
06/08/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Received Change of Address Notification for attorney Andrew S. Myers. Nos. 29901, 30223.
11/22/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from attorney Andrew Myers. He is no longer practicing law in the State of Nevada, and requests that all correspondence be sent to his Cincinnati address.
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 11, 2000 at the hour of 9:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM, MS, NB)
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/03/2000Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Change of Address for Andrew S. Myers. - P.O. Box 6795 Aurora - IL - 60598-0795.
01/03/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Re-mailed oral argument reminder notice to Andrew S. Myers - P.O. Box 6795 Aurora, IL - 60598-0795.
01/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on January 11, 2000. We have determined that this matter should be heard by the En Banc Court. We hereby vacate the argument currently scheduled in this matter and direct the clerk of this court to reschedule argument on the next available En Banc Calendar. (Called counsel).
02/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for March 29, 2000 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (En Banc) 00-01640
03/08/2000MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion to Continue Oral Arguemnt Set for 3/29/00. Notice of Change of Address 00-03664
03/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Rescheduling Oral Argument. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for March 29, 2000, at 11:00 a.m. in Carson City and direct the clerk to reschedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available en banc oral argument calendar for 30 minutes. 00-04208
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for June 15, 2000 at the hour of 9:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City.(En Banc) 00-06568
05/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-08890
06/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: En Banc. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB.
11/30/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." fn8[On appeal, Glenda also contended that the district court miscalculated the amount of her child support obligation. At oral argument, Antonio's counsel represented to this court that the daughter is now over eighteen years of age and that Antonio is not seeking to collect child support arrearages. Therefore, this issue is moot.] Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Agosti, J. We concur: Rose, C.J., Young, J., Maupin, J., Shearing, J., Leavitt, J., and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 107. En Banc. 00-20906
12/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20989
12/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2000. 00-20989