judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK AND LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN

Case Heading (S-08-0060)
Case Number:S-08-0060Case Docketed On:03/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:MARK AND LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN
Full Title:MARK AND LAURA VOSS, Appellants (Defendants), v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark VossMark Towne Voss
Laura M. Voss
AppellantLaura VossMark Towne Voss
Laura M. Voss
AppelleeBeverly B. GoodmanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:2009 WY 40
Citation:203 P.3d 415

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/15/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/15/2008Motion - Other - motion for correction or modification of the record pursuant to W.R.A.P. 3.04MotionOtherFinal
04/16/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/21/2008Response/Objection - Motion for correction or modification of the recordResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/29/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/07/2008Order - Denying motion for correction or modification of the recordOrderDenyFinal
05/29/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/08/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Attachment appendix to brief of appellantsNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
07/24/2008Event - Other - received hard copy of appellants' reply brief. Advised that it needs to be e-filed; counsel will take care of training and filingEventOtherFinal
07/24/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/10/2008Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Norman E. Young is assigned to act in this matter, and recusing Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/18/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/08/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/6/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal