judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. L. C. BANKS v. MRS. DOROTHY BANKS

Case: A-2720
A-2720
05/19/1950
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. L. C. BANKS
MRS. DOROTHY BANKS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/25/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/13/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/06/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/25/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/01/1950Response to Brief filed
07/25/1950Brief in Support of Petition
07/13/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/06/1950Reply to Response
05/25/1950Response to Petition
05/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/19/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Dorothy BanksRespondent
Mrs. L. C. BanksPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information