judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES DEMASIO MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0025)
Case Number:S-08-0025Case Docketed On:02/08/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JAMES DEMASIO MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES DEMASIO MARTINEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Demasio MartinezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 6
Citation:199 P.3d 526

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/27/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/27/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen Parker for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from district court clerk's office indicating that record is ready, but jury instructions are missing. She has contacted counsel requesting return, but record may be late.EventPhone CallFinal
06/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions & verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits; Volume V, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/23/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/27/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for 1/26/09 for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/12/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate sent to the Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary signed for 2/11/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/12/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal