judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZACHARIAH NEWTON STRANGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0026)
Parent:S-08-0026Case Docketed On:02/08/2008
Consolidated: S-08-0047
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ZACHARIAH NEWTON STRANGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ZACHARIAH NEWTON STRANGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantZachariah Newton StrangeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2008 WY 132
Citation:195 P.3d 1041

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/12/2008Motion - Consolidate - with S-08-0047MotionConsolidateFinal
03/12/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received appellant's motion to consolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/13/2008Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/21/2008Brief - Appellant (Notice: The file stamp on this e-filed document is incorrect due to a problem with a system update. It bears the Montana Supreme Court watermark. The original has been filed with the Clerk of the Wyoming Supreme Court)BriefAppellantFinal
04/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan for appellant, Graham Macdonald Smith for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/13/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding for a new trial. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card sent to WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card (Warden)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal