judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

N RE: CHARLES EDWARD JONES, APLT

Case Information: 10-SP-1190
Short Caption: N RE: CHARLES EDWARD JONES, APLTClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC675-10Filed Date:09/21/2010

Opening Event Date:09/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/13/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles Edward Jones, Jr.YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/04/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 21, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/13/2010RECORD INDEX
10/13/2010RECORD COPIES
10/13/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of October 26, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (Castillo)
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Titled: Appellant's Complaint for Lack of Service & Representation from Appointed Counsel).
02/02/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subjet this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: JAC)
03/15/2011ORDERED: That this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/15/2011DISMISSED
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Titled Appellant's Motion for Relief Rule 60).
04/07/2011RECEIVED Appellant's brief (marcn still pend).
04/07/2011RECEIVED appendix
04/29/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
04/29/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/29/2011APPENDIX
05/31/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/30/11
06/21/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/29/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
06/30/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to supp rec
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AND CLERK SHALL FILE LODGED SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD AND GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/19/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (SUPERIOR COURT DOCUMENTS)
09/19/2011FiledAffirmed
10/11/2011FiledMandate