judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife

Case Heading (S-08-0021)
Case Number:S-08-0021Case Docketed On:02/01/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife
Full Title:MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife, Appellee (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMargot BeldenRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppellantFish Creek Design, LLCRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeJohn ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeStacy ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 145
Citation:197 P.3d 148

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/01/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/10/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/10/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/31/2008Brief - Appellants and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
05/15/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Noble for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts & exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Heather Noble for appellants; David G. Lewis for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/05/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/2/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal