judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. E. MCDONALD v. JOHN C. CALHOUN, CHAIRMAN, ET AL., J. H. SULLIVAN

Case: A-2758
A-2758
06/14/1950
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
J. E. MCDONALD
JOHN C. CALHOUN, CHAIRMAN, ET AL., J. H. SULLIVAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/19/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/17/1950Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedPetitioner
06/15/1950Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/21/1950Opinion issued
06/20/1950Miscellaneous letter
06/20/1950Response to Motion filed
06/19/1950Brief on the Merits
06/19/1950Response to Motion filed
06/17/1950Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
06/15/1950Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
06/14/1950Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. E. McDonaldPetitioner
John C. Calhoun, Chairman, et al.Respondent
J. H. SullivanRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information