judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH WILSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0020)
Case Number:S-08-0020Case Docketed On:02/01/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JOSEPH WILSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSEPH WILSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph WilsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
John Derek King
Andy Sears
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 1
Citation:199 P.3d 517

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/02/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/16/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Andy Sears to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
07/03/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/14/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andy Sears, Student Intern, for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane Elizabeth Courselle, Director DAP, Andy Sears, Student Intern, on behalf of appellant, argument by Mr. Sears, and Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General on behalf of appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal