judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREEN VS. GREEN

Case Information: 34833
Short Caption:GREEN VS. GREENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D225552Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/1999 / Allf, NancySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08723
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nancy L. Allf. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Brian C. Tanko of the law firm of Jeffrey L. Burr & Associates is hereby substitued as attorney for the Appellant above-named, in place and instead of Ronald L. Cordes. 99-13257
01/11/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
02/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, pay the filing fee and file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-01789
02/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-02005
02/08/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-02007
02/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court. We defer ruling on the stipulation to dismiss this apepal pending the submission of the filing fee. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. 00-02505
03/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jeffrey L. Burr & Associates-check no. 6133.
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. 00-06746
04/26/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.