judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAXTON ENTEPRISES VS. WEINGARTEN NOSTAT

Case Information: 32813
Short Caption:PAXTON ENTEPRISES VS. WEINGARTEN NOSTATCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388344Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/14/1998 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1998Other Other. Voluntary recusal of Justice Young from participation in this matter (Lionel Sawyer firm).
08/06/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. (Jason Landess-check no. 32813-$200.00)
08/06/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
08/14/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended further order of this court.)
08/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/24/1998Other Other. Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement, Civil Appeals.
11/05/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The settlement conference is continued.
12/04/1998BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 12/3/98)
12/04/1998AppendixReceived Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
12/21/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From letter from Settlement Judge Aurbach re: status of settlement negotiations. The conference is continued to 12/16/98.
02/03/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
02/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court.
02/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We direct the clerk to file appellant's opening brief and the joint appendix that we received on December 4, 1998. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 1[WITHIN 15 days from the date of this order, appellant shall either file a certificate that no transcript shall be requested, or indicate which transcripts will be requested.]
02/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
02/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
03/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. NRAP 9(a) Certificate. No transcript is to be requested. Mailed on: 3/2/99.
03/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/25/99.)
04/27/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 4/26/99.)
06/11/1999Other Other. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
06/11/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
03/13/2000Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-06798
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-08512
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-08512