judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODNEY ALLOWAY v. RT CAPITAL, INC.

Case Heading (S-08-0042)
Case Number:S-08-0042Case Docketed On:02/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:RODNEY ALLOWAY v. RT CAPITAL, INC.
Full Title:RODNEY ALLOWAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. RT CAPITAL, INC., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRodney Alloway Pro Se
AppelleeRT Capital, Inc.Larry W. Harrington

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 123
Citation:193 P.3d 713 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/21/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/26/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/07/2008Brief - Appellant and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/09/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/18/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/31/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal