judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT JOHNSON V. D.C. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1206
Short Caption:ROBERT JOHNSON V. D.C. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP4144-08Filed Date:09/22/2010

Opening Event Date:09/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/20/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Johnson N
Frederic W. Schwartz, Jr.YY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Fire and Emergency ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/12/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 22, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
10/19/2010 AMENDED ORDER On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 22, 2010, it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC)
10/20/2010RECORD ON APPEAL (volumes 1-4)
10/20/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
12/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 21, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 20, 2011
01/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 20, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/17/11
02/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before February 17, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
02/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed) * (partial consent) elp (Titled as: Motion for Extension of Time . . .)
02/22/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief (no appendix)
03/01/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and to file the appendix within 10 days of the completion of briefing, and the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant is filed. It is
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/01/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the appendix shall be filed within 10 calendar days from the completion of briefing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs of appellees shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31.
03/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (D.C. Fire &EMS) no oppo to 4/27/11
03/31/2011 On consideration of appellee the District of Columbia Fire and EMS Department's consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and upon further consideration of this court's order of March 1, 2011, which directed appellee the District of Columbia Office of Employee Appeals to file its brief on or before March 28, 2011, and it appearing that the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellee the District of Columbia Fire and EMS Department's motion is granted and its brief shall be filed on or before April 27, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee the District of Columbia Office of Employee Appeals' shal within 15 days from the date of this order submit their brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (JAC) elp
04/26/2011APPELEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 27, 2011 (no oppo) (DC Fire and EMS Dept)
04/27/2011 On consideration of appellee the District of Columbia Fire and EMS Department's consent motion for an extension of within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee the District of Columbia Fire and EMS Department's brief shall be filed on or before May 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
05/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (filed by: Holly M. Johnson) District of Columbia Fire & EMS Department)
06/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 31, 2011, which directed appellee the District of Columbia Office of Employee Appeals to file its brief within 15 days accompanied by a motion for leave to file brief out of time, and it appearing that the brief has not been filed, and on further consideration of this court's order of March 1, 2011, which granted appellant's motion to file the appendix within 10 days of completion of briefing, it is ORDERED that the appendix shall be filed within 10 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (ETW) elp
06/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/15/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until July 11, 2011 (no oppo).
06/23/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/28/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to this Court's July 14, 2011 Order re filing of the appendix and scheduling this matter for consideration
07/06/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/13/2011FiledOrder Granting APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant), and the appendix shall be filed within 10 calendar days thereafter.
08/10/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until August 12, 2011 (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until September 2, 2011(Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - a reply brief (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledAppendix vol. I & II (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/23/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File a reply brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (aplt)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/02/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Easterly, Pryor
03/01/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
03/23/2012FiledMandate
04/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing and/or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
04/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motin for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 4/26/12.