judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BEST MOTOR LINES v. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, CHAUFFEURS, WAREHOUSEMEN AND HELPERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL NO. 745, ET AL.

Case: A-2739
A-2739
06/02/1950
Application for Writ of Error
BEST MOTOR LINES
INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, CHAUFFEURS, WAREHOUSEMEN AND HELPERS OF AMERICA, LOCAL NO. 745, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/07/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/26/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
12/20/1950Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/18/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/11/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/22/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/12/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/11/1951Order from Lower Court filed
03/22/1951Motion to Strike filed
03/19/1951Response to Motion filed
03/07/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/21/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
02/21/1951Opinion issued
12/26/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
12/20/1950Reply to Response
12/18/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/11/1950Response to Brief filed
11/25/1950Letter Filed
11/22/1950Brief on the Merits
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1950Response to Petition
06/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, Local No. 745, et al.Respondent
Best Motor LinesPetitioner
Brown and Root, IncorporatedAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information