judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF THOMAS

Case Information: 32041
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF THOMASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P38672Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/03/1998 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/11/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McKnight & Hendrix-check no. 0003103).
03/26/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
04/03/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/06/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Laurie Webb.
04/10/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
07/23/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/28/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Court Reporter Laurie Webb shall have 30 days from this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b). Appellant shall have 100 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Justice Leavitt disqualified from participation in this matter.
01/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/6/99.
01/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
03/05/1999MotionFiled Stipulation.
03/12/1999BriefReceived Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/11/99.
03/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The stipulation filed on March 5, 1999, was not timely filed. We disapprove the stipulation. Nevertheless, respondent's counsel having shown good cause, we direct the clerk to file forthwith the answering brief, provisionally submitted on March 12, 1999. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file a reply brief.
03/29/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief.
05/03/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/28/99.
06/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: 6/11/99.
06/11/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/04/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-07246
05/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09131
05/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-09131