judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AUTOZONE DEV. CORP., ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1205
Short Caption:AUTOZONE DEV. CORP., ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Lead: 10-CV-0822 Consolidated:10-CV-1205
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR3108-07Filed Date:09/22/2010

Opening Event Date:09/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAutozone Development CorporationN
Steven A. PozefskyNY
AppellantAutozone Stores Inc.N
Steven A. PozefskyNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeNational Capital RevitalizationN
William D. Burk NN
AppelleeRla Revitalization CorporationN
William D. Burk NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY -of order in Superior Court (emergency)
10/04/2010RECEIVED - REVISED certificate of service
10/05/2010TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY motion for stay - motion for summary affirmance AND oppo to stay - reply - oppo to motion for summary affirmance
10/06/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/7/10 & 5/5/10) (elp)
10/12/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AND opposition to emergency motion to stay pending appeal
10/20/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY- memorandum in support of their emergency motion for stay pending appeal
10/22/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Affirmance
11/02/2010 ORDERED that the SHOW CAUSE ORDER IN APPEAL NO. 10CV822 IS HEREBY VACATED. It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL NOS. 10CV822 & 10CV1205 ARE CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is ****MORE****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED... It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA's MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mg't Inc. v. Nt'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914 (DC 1979). It is *****MORE*****
11/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal are hereby AFFIRMED. (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED