judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JAMES FITZGERALD, JR. v. H. WINSTON HULL CHARLES C. GREEN

Case: A-2738
A-2738
06/02/1950
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES FITZGERALD, JR.
H. WINSTON HULL CHARLES C. GREEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/23/1951Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae
03/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/20/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/27/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/12/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1956Letter Filed
03/23/1951Amicus Curiae Letter Received
03/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1951Brief in Support of Petition
02/27/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
02/14/1951Concurring Opinion issued.
02/14/1951Opinion issued
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1950Response to Petition
06/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hill D. HudsonAmicus Curiae
H. Winston Hull Charles C. GreenRespondent
Boyd LaughlinAmicus Curiae
James Fitzgerald, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information