judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KARA WALTERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0037)
Case Number:S-08-0037Case Docketed On:02/14/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:KARA WALTERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KARA WALTERS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerKara WaltersR. Michael Vang
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2008 WY 159
Citation:197 P.3d 1273

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/14/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/14/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/14/2008Petition - Writ - review, and received copy on disk.PetitionWrit - reviewFinal
03/11/2008Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/25/2008Brief - Petitioner and received copy of brief on diskBriefPetitionerFinal
04/29/2008Event - Phone Call - Mike Pauling called regarding whether or not to do a designation of record since Rule 13 and Rule 3 are not entirely clear. Told him he could do a designation.EventPhone CallFinal
06/11/2008Brief - Respondent; received copy of brief on disk and desigantion of recordBriefRespondentFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/09/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Michael Vang for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robin Sessions Cooley for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (R. Michael Vang for appellant and Robin Sessions Cooley for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for by Wyoming Women's Center Warden on 1/2/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal