judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ODIS G. MCDUFFIE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1201
Short Caption:ODIS G. MCDUFFIE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CF-1228 Consolidated:10-CO-1201
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-25615-08Filed Date:09/22/2010

Opening Event Date:09/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:05/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOdis G. Mcduffie N
Christopher R. PudelskiNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CF-1228 and 10-CO-1201 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Christopher R. Pudelski, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1201. F/O that, inappeal no. 10-CO-1201, counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christopher R. Pudelski, Esquire for 10-CO-1201
10/22/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to suspend prior briefing schedule pending preparation of transcript in new appeal 10 co 1201
10/28/2010ORDERED that apellant's motion is granted and a consolidated briefing order will be scheduled upon completion of the record in appeal no. 10-CO-1201. F/O that appellant's statement regarding transcript, in appeal no. 10-CO-1201, remains due on or before November 8, 2010. (JAC)
11/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CO-1201) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (135 pgs/Hunt) 9/20/10 proc. w/cd
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CO-1201)
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CO-1201)
01/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2 wks. no oppo
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011. (JAC)
02/28/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix
02/28/2011APPENDIX
04/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 31 days to May 5, 2011 (no oppo).
04/05/2011 On consideration of appellee's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 5, 2011. (Castillo)
05/05/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/05/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/18/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF 11 days no oppo
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011. (JAC)
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/06/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
08/29/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledOrder directing parties to address certain issues at oral argument.
11/02/2011FiledAMENDED Order directing parties to address certain issues at oral argument.
11/04/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
11/07/2011FiledArgued Before Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Steadman Christopher R. Pudelski, Esquire Ben Schrader, Esquire
11/08/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
06/25/2012FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/09/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
08/16/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc.
08/23/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/24/2012FiledMandate