judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BESNILIAN VS. WILKINSON

Case Information: 32032
Short Caption:BESNILIAN VS. WILKINSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39190
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9507803Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/17/2001 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/17/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Richard G. Hill-check no. 1660-$100 and check no. 1662-$100.
03/26/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
03/26/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from C. Nicholas Pereos-check no. 11380.
03/26/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant).
04/03/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services.
04/08/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from George Besnilian-check no. 1532.
04/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal.
04/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/10/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Cross-Appeal
06/11/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings January 20, 1998 and January 21, 1998. Court Reporters: Constance S. Eisenberg and Wendy L. Pearson.
06/16/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service (Transcript).
06/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Cross-appellants/respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court.
07/20/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Cross-Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause.
07/27/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Joinder in Cross-Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.
08/17/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We ordered respondents to show cause why the cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We conclude that their contention lacks merit and order the cross-appeal dismissed. The remaining appeal shall proceed as follows. fn1[We direct the clerk to alter the caption on this court's docket so that it reflects the status of the parties.] Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent's Wilkinson and Chang shall have 30 days after service of appellant's brief to serve and file their answering brief. Appellant shall then have 30 days to serve and file her reply brief, if any. Pursuant to NRAP 46, respondent George Besnilian, appearing in proper person, may not file wirtten briefs or papers in this appeal without leave of this court.
10/16/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
11/25/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have 10 days to file the opening brief and appendix.
11/25/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief.
11/25/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.
12/21/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 25, 1999.
12/24/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service by Mail.
01/15/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 1/14/99.
02/12/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 12, 1999.
03/11/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 3/11/99.
05/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: 5/12/99.
05/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/05/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Oral Argument 00-09429
06/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Request for Oral Argument. 00-10037
10/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This appeal was previously submitted on the briefs and record filed herein. We have subsequently determined that oral argument would be of assistance in the disposition of this appeal. Oral argument is hereby scheduled for December 11, 2000, at the hour of 2:00 p.m., in Carson City. The argument is limited to 30 minutes. fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's motion for oral argument. Respondent George Besnilian has not been granted leave to appear in proper person and therefore will not be heard at oral argument.] 00-18971
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 11, 2000 at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
10/31/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-19180
11/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for December 11, 2000, at 2:00 p.m., and direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this appeal for oral argument on January 17, 2001, in Carson City before the Northern Nevada Panel. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 00-20392
11/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 17, 2001 at 8:30 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
12/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
02/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Washoe County Clerk requesting certified copies of: (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment filed on October 14, 1996; (2) Plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for partial summary judgment filed on October 18, 1996; (3) Defendant's response and opposition filed on October 28, 1996; and (4) Plaintiff's reply filed on October 29, 1996. 01-03656
03/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (1) Motion for Summary Judgment filed on October 14, 1996; (2) Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion that Certain Facts be Deemed Established filed on October 18, 1996; (3) Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine filed on October 28, 1996; and (4) Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motio that Certain Facts be Established filed on October 29, 1996. 01-03901
06/21/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. By the court, Shearing, J. We concur: Maupin, C.J., Young, Leavitt, and Becker, JJ. Agosti, J., concurring. Rose, J., dissenting. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 45. En Banc 01-10475
07/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10514
07/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-10514