judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JILL L. DURFEE v. CHRISTOPHER R. DURFEE

Case Heading (S-08-0036)
Case Number:S-08-0036Case Docketed On:02/14/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JILL L. DURFEE v. CHRISTOPHER R. DURFEE
Full Title:JILL L. DURFEE, Appellant (Defendant/Petitioner), v. CHRISTOPHER R. DURFEE, Appellee (Plaintiff/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJill L. DurfeeChristopher Michael Wages
AppelleeChristopher R. DurfeeMark L. Hughes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 7
Citation:199 P.3d 1087

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/14/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/14/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/27/2008Brief - Appellant with statement of costs attached and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
05/12/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/28/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/30/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, exhibits; Volumes III-IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/27/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/12/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/12/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/17/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal