judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLARA MILLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1200
Short Caption:CLARA MILLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1182-09Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/29/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClara Mills Y
Gaillard T. HuntYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Suzanne C. NylandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gaillard Hunt, Esquire
11/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6pgs/Tape) 5/16/09 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 6/5/09 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7pgs/Peterson-Hart) 7/15/09 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8pgs/Tape) 8/31/09 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8pgs/Tape) 10/30/09 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (5pgs/Tape) 1/25/10 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (7pgs/Tape) 5/13/10 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (6pgs/Tape) 7/1/10 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (4pgs/Tape) 7/29/10 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (16pgs/Tape) 8/10/10 proc. w/CD
01/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 30, 2011 (no oppo)
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/31/2011APPENDIX
07/07/2011MISCELLANEOUS - aplt's consent to aple's motion to consolidate w/10-CM-767 & stay briefing.
08/12/2011FiledOrdered that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
09/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 12, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
09/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 12, 2011
10/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/03/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledMotion To Submit Without Oral Argument or Change Date of Argument. (Appellant)Granted
03/13/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to submit.
04/03/2012FiledArgued Before Thompson,Oberly,Reid. Galillard T. Hunt Esq.,for appellant. Suzanne C. Nyland Esq.,for appellee.
06/07/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
08/07/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Thompson, Associate Judge, and reid, Senior Judge.)
08/17/2012FiledNotice Received re: options (Appellant)
08/29/2012FiledMandate