judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH D. PROCTOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1198
Short Caption:JOSEPH D. PROCTOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-17355-09Filed Date:09/21/2010

Opening Event Date:09/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/17/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/13/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ivan M. Waldman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to September 22, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recordiing Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4 pgs/tape) 7/6/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (106 pgs/Johnson) 7/6/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (149 pgs/Johnson) 7/7/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8 pgs/Johnson) 7/8/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 9/21/10 proc w/cd
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
12/30/2010RECORD INDEX
12/30/2010RECORD COPIES
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 120 days. no oppo
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. (JAC)
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/10/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on May 31, 2011, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before May 31, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
06/23/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX no oppo
06/23/2011RECEIVED- aplt's appendix
07/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (Castillo)
07/06/2011LIMITED APPENDIX
08/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/05/2011FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2012FiledSubmitted To judge Beckwith,Oberly,Terry
11/15/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge)
11/26/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/17/2013FiledMandate