judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHWARTZ VS. SIIS

Case Information: 32004
Short Caption:SCHWARTZ VS. SIISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A365663Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/26/1998 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/12/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Craig P. Kenny & Associates.
03/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
03/25/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
03/26/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 3/18/98.
06/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel.
07/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
07/21/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: No postmark. STRICKEN BY ORDER 9/22/98.
09/02/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/22/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). The clerk shall forthwith strike the opening brief received on July 21, 1998, because (1) it was filed while briefing in this matter was suspended pursuant to NRAP 16(c) and (2) it was not filed with an appendix. (Appellant's Opening Brief filed 7/21/98--STRICKEN).
09/28/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
01/21/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/19/99.
01/21/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Service.
02/04/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/2/99.
03/03/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 3/1/99.
05/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: 5/12/99.
05/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15738
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15794
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2000. 00-15794