judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALLIED FINANCE COMPANY, ET AL. v. UNION FINANCE COMPANY

Case: A-2744
A-2744
06/07/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ALLIED FINANCE COMPANY, ET AL.
UNION FINANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1950Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
07/19/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/26/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/18/1950Additional Copies received
10/18/1950Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
10/17/1950Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
07/19/1950Motion for RehearingFiling granted
06/26/1950Supplemental Brief filed
06/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Union Finance CompanyRespondent
Allied Finance Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information