judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM FOR BENEFITS FOR HOWARD W. WILLIAMS, DECEASED EMPLOYEE OF CAPITOL CITY MAINTENANCE, INC.: SHARON WILLIAMS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0034)
Case Number:S-08-0034Case Docketed On:02/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM FOR BENEFITS FOR HOWARD W. WILLIAMS, DECEASED EMPLOYEE OF CAPITOL CITY MAINTENANCE, INC.: SHARON WILLIAMS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM FOR BENEFITS FOR HOWARD W. WILLIAMS, DECEASED EMPLOYEE OF CAPITOL CITY MAINTENANCE, INC.: SHARON WILLIAMS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSharon WilliamsDonald J. Sullivan
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Clarence Demers
James Michael Causey
Other Particpants
Amicus curiaeWatchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc.Paul D. Polidoro
Keturah A. Dunne
Diana Sampson Rhodes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 57
Citation:205 P.3d 1024

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/12/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
02/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/27/2008Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Accept. Case converted from Rule 11 CertificationOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
04/14/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/25/2008Motion - Amicus - leave to participate; and received proposed brief.MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
04/25/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Paul D. PolidoroMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
04/25/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Keturah A. DunneMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/02/2008Response/Objection - Motion of Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. to file amicus curiae brief.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/20/2008Order - Amicus - grant participation and grant motion for admission pro hac vice for Paul D. Polidoro and Keturah A. DunneOrderAmicus - grant participationFinal
05/20/2008Brief - Amicus curiae and recieved copy of brief on diskBriefAmicus curiaeFinal
06/02/2008Brief - Appellee, received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Don Sullivan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Causey for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authority (Hardcopy - will be submitting eletronically within three days)Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/12/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donald J. Sullivan for Appellant; James Michael Causey, Senior Assistant Attorney General for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal