judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

M. FITZALLEN PRIDGEN v. PAUL BUBELLA, ET AL.

Case: A-2749
A-2749
06/08/1950
Application for Writ of Error
M. FITZALLEN PRIDGEN
PAUL BUBELLA, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/14/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/28/1952Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
07/20/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/08/1950Letter Filed
06/14/1950Response to Petition
06/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. Fitzallen PridgenPetitioner
Paul Bubella, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information