judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWARD HUGHES CORP. VS. HARDING

Case Information: 31155
Short Caption:HOWARD HUGHES CORP. VS. HARDINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A370235Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/14/1997 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/12/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McGroarty and Lane - check no 13895.
10/06/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/14/1997Other Other. Filed Certificate re: Transcript of Proceedings. (No transcript preparation required.)
10/14/1997Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/16/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
05/11/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
05/14/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Craig A. Hoppe re: Status of several pending Settlement Conferences. (Nos. 31538, 31537, 31155, 30599, 31529, 30242, and 30274.
05/21/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
08/03/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: No postmark.)
08/03/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
08/31/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including September 30, 1998, to file the answering brief.
10/02/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 9/30/98)
11/03/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 11/2/98)
05/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
05/12/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day.
05/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/03/1999MotionFiled Motion. For substitution of parties.
08/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Granting motion to substitute party. The clerk shall forthwith amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect the substitution of respondent Robert D. Harding, Jr., as Special Administrator of the Estate of Joni Minton. (Caption and case cards amended.)
07/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney J. Michael McGroarty. Jerry Collier Lane is no longer an associate with his firm and no longer represents appellant in this matter. 00-12966
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we order this appeal dismissed and remand the case to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15733
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Publication of Order. 00-16645
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15790
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/03/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Publication. 00-17497
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2000. 00-15790
01/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 20, 2000, respondent filed a motion requesting this court to publish the Order Dismissing Appeal entered in this matter on September 7, 2000. On October 3, 2000, appellant file an opposition to that motion. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 01-00735