judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAROLD SHORES and KATHLEEN SHORES v. ROY BUCKLIN and ANNE BUCKLIN

Case Heading (S-08-0033)
Case Number:S-08-0033Case Docketed On:02/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:DAROLD SHORES and KATHLEEN SHORES v. ROY BUCKLIN and ANNE BUCKLIN
Full Title:DAROLD SHORES and KATHLEEN SHORES, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ROY BUCKLIN and ANNE BUCKLIN, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDarold ShoresJohn Craig Abraham
AppellantKathleen ShoresJohn Craig Abraham
AppelleeRoy BucklinStephen L. Simonton
AppelleeAnne BucklinStephen L. Simonton

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Property - Real - Adverse Possession
Opinion Number:2009 WY 4
Citation:199 P.3d 1083

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/11/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/15/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/15/2008Affidavit - Other - Mary Barrows, Court ReporterAffidavitOtherFinal
02/19/2008Affidavit - Other - received original copy of court reporter's affidavitAffidavitOtherFinal
03/11/2008Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
03/18/2008System - Status check - other - contacted counsel for appellant regarding overdue sanction for failure to provide NOA. Mr. Abraham apologized and said the check is in the mail.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
03/20/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
03/26/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/11/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
04/11/2008Brief - Other - Received original and five copies of appellants' untimely briefBriefOtherFinal
04/11/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel re untimely brief, left messageEventPhone CallFinal
04/21/2008Petition - Reinstatement and copy of brief of appellants requestedPetitionReinstatementFinal
05/07/2008Order - Reinstatement. Order granting petition to reinstate appealOrderReinstatementFinal
05/07/2008Brief - Appellant'sBriefAppellantFinal
05/09/2008Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Mr. Simonton's office. They never received a copy of the petition to reinstate appeal filed by Mr. Abraham. They had closed their file and then received our order granting petition to reinstate appeal. Advised him they were listed on his certificate of service.EventPhone CallFinal
05/19/2008Motion - Other - requiring appellants' counsel to serve filings by facsimile transmissionMotionOtherFinal
06/03/2008Order - Denying motion to require service by faxOrderDenyFinal
06/04/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
06/05/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/09/2008Correspondence - Outgoing other - sent letter to Mr. Abraham requesting postal money order for $150.00 sanction. (Check returned due to closed account).CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/20/2008Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re appellants' designation of record. Called counsel, did not file a designation pursuant Wyo. R. App. P. 3.05(b), said he always designates entire record in criminal cases, so just sent entire record. Advised Clerk to send letter stating the sameEventPhone CallFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Incoming - No designation of recordNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
06/30/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/30/2008Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
07/10/2008Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
07/10/2008Record - Other - called District Court Clerk re designation of record by counsel for appellants. Designation not filed; directed her to send the record designated by counsel for appelleesRecordOtherFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/18/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/21/2008Correspondence - Incoming letter of transmitted record from the District Court ClerkCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/05/2008Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/04/2009Affidavit - Attorney fees and costsAffidavitAttorney fees and costsFinal
02/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' affidavit and statement of costs and attorney fees incurred to defend appeal and appellees' notice of statement of fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2009Service - Mail returned - Copy of opinion sent to Mr. Abraham returned. Envelope states - attempted, not known; Not at this address; return to sender.ServiceMail returnedFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Internal - Other - Was notified by IT department that attorney address changes have not been updated to our system since the December 5, 2008 build. Mr. Abraham's address was updated with the Wyoming State Bar on December 15, 2008. Did not discover this problem until we received the returned mail.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Internal - Other. Re-sent Opinion and everything filed since to Mr. Abraham at current address listed with the bar.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
02/24/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs as sanctionOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/26/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal