judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERNON L. LONG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1197
Short Caption:VERNON L. LONG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:10-CF-1197Consolidated: 11-CF-0596
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-25148-09Filed Date:09/16/2010

Opening Event Date:09/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVernon L. Long Y
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John L. HillYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas T. Heslep, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas T. Hselep, Esquire
11/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2004, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
12/03/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
12/03/2010RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
12/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (35 pgs/Burr) 4/30/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (15 pgs/Ott) 5/3/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (209 pgs/Ott) 5/4/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (129 pgs/Ott) 5/5/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (21 pgs/Jeon) 5/10/10 proc. w/cd
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
02/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 21, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Castillo)
02/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 1, 2011 (no oppo)
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. (JAC)
05/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 25, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before April 1, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/6/11. no oppo
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
05/17/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/17/2011APPENDIX
06/17/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1197 and 11-CF-596 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Joanne M. Vasco, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Michael L. Cowan in appeal no. 11-CF-596. F/O that, in appeal no. 11-CF-596, counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appelalnt must advise the CCourt Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/21/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/21/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/20/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (Michael Cowan)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/22/2011LodgedReceived courtesy copy of pro se letter from Appellant to court-appointed counsel regarding attorney client relationship and lines of communication being kept open. (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (26 pgs/tape) 8/17/10 proc. w/cd
08/25/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-596)
08/25/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-596)
09/01/2011FiledBriefing Order for appellant Leon Cowan only.
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Cowan) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Michael Leon Cowan's motion for extension to file brief brief and limited appendix to 1/9/12.
01/09/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) (Cowan)
01/09/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) (Cowan)
02/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/31/2012FiledSubmitted to Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
06/06/2012FiledLetter From appellee regarding exhibits 9 and 10 which were requested by the Court (CDs attached) (Appellee)
07/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Glickman, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
09/19/2012FiledMandate
11/20/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant-Cowan)