judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

D.C. DCRA V. D.C. PERB ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1203
Short Caption:D.C. DCRA V. D.C. PERB ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8104-09Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/30/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY
James T. Langford NN
Mary L. WilsonNY
AppelleePublic Employee Relations BoardN
Bruce A. Fredrickson NN
AppelleeAmerican Federation of GovermentN
Charles A. Hobbie NN
Leisha Self NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/12/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 20, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
10/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (opp) (elp)
11/05/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to dismiss this appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
11/05/2010DISMISSED
11/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived