judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAIG ALAN DEMEULENAERE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0039)
Case Number:S-08-0039Case Docketed On:02/19/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:CRAIG ALAN DEMEULENAERE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CRAIG ALAN DEMEULENAERE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCraig Alan DemeulenaereDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2008 WY 147
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/19/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant re appointment. The State Public Defender is not appointed althought that was intent of counsel. Counsel will present amended order to District Judge.EventPhone CallFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - Order on motion of W. Keith Goody to withdraw and for appointment of the Public Defender to prosecute appealNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Other - forwarded copy of order to State Public Defender and Attorney GeneralNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
04/07/2008Brief - Appellant (Notice: The file stamp on this e-filed document is incorrect due to a problem with a system update. It bears the Montana Supreme Court watermark. The original has been filed with the Clerk of the Wyoming Supreme Court)BriefAppellantFinal
04/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Pre-Sentence Investigation; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/31/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/5/09 by Marilyn Jensen.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal