judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERTS VS. ROBERTS

Case Information: 32770
Short Caption:ROBERTS VS. ROBERTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D211847Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/01/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
07/31/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert E. Glennen III-check no. 1353.
08/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 27, 1998.
08/20/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document.
08/27/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (first request).
08/27/1998Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
08/28/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
09/04/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Deny Appellants Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement.
09/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement and transcript request form. The clerk shall forthwith file the docketing statement and transcript request form provisionally submitted on August 27, 1998, and August 28, 1998, respectively. We deny any relief sought by the proper person document submitted by respondent on September 4, 1998. [Fn1]Respondent has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. We have received and considered respondent's submission. We caution respondent that should she desire to file documents herein, she should either retain counsel or seek prior leave of this court to file documents in proper person.]
09/22/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Deborah Casper.
09/22/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/01/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
10/29/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person and to Submit District Court Documents (Received the original and 1 copy).
10/29/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. 12/18/97 and 06/01/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah Casper.
12/02/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2.
02/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 29, 1998, respondent submitted a proper person motion for leave to proceed in proper person and to submit district court documents. We deny respondent's motion at this time. Should respondent feel it necessary to address any argument presented in appellant's brief, she may refile a motion seeking leave to file a proper person answering brief. [fn1] On October 29, 1998, the clerk of this court filed certified copies of the transcripts of the lower court proceedings. Court reporter Deborah S. Casper's October 1, 1998, motion for an extension of time to file the transcripts is denied as moot.
02/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief or show cause why this matter should not be dismissed as abandoned. Response due: 15 days.
03/15/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/11/99/.
04/19/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person and to Submit Court Documents (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to respondent).
04/19/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to respondent).
04/19/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Respondent's Appendix (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to respondent).
04/23/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person and to Submit Court Documents.
04/23/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief.
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's motion for the limited purpose of filing the answering brief and appendix. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on April 23, 1999. Appellant has 30 days from the date of this order or the date of service of respondent's answering brief, whichever is later, to file a reply brief, if any. [fn1] We emphasize that our order does not grant respondent leave to file any other papers in proper person in this matter.
04/28/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Answering Brief.
04/28/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Respondent's Proper Person Appendix on Appeal.
06/01/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 5/28/99
06/01/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08715
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10356
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 2000. 00-10356