judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUSH VS. CHRISTEAN

Case Information: 32286
Short Caption:BUSH VS. CHRISTEANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 28770Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/14/1998 / Gladstone, ArthurSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 (Thomas L. Stringfield--check no. 3258).
05/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/11/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley.
05/14/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Arthur A. Gladstone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/18/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
07/13/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report: The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
07/23/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Court reporter Lisa Manley shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and complete the transcript requested by appellant pursuant to the transcript request filed on May 11, 1998. Appellant shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1).
09/30/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Reporter Manley shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file with this court a certificate acknowledging delivery of the completed transcript, together with a certified copy of the transcript, or otherwise inform this court of the staus of the transcript.
10/05/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Court Reporter.)
10/20/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcipt of Proceedings. Motions Hearing--3/13/98. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley.
11/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Court Reporter Manley's motion for an extension of time is denied as moot. A certified copy of the requested transcript was filed in this court on October 20, 1998.
11/03/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. That appellant may have to and including December 7, 1998, within which to file the opening brief.
12/03/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 12/2/98).
12/03/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
12/30/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. That Respondent shall have to and including February 1, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
02/01/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 2/1/99).
02/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 2/1/99).
02/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 2/25/99).
05/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
05/12/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day.
02/15/2000Other Other. Case resubmitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this day. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
02/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-05007
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06612
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2000. 00-06612