judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS (MAX) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34841
Short Caption:THOMAS (MAX) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7478Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08797
10/04/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 28, 1999, August 16, 1999. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 99-09512
10/13/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: October 20, 1999. 99-09893
10/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10242
10/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10244
10/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplement to Appendix to Appellant's Fast Track Statement. 99-10342
10/27/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. October 20, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. 99-10521
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11107
03/01/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03202
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04923
03/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2000. 00-04923