judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOB, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. RAINBOW CANYON, INC., a Wyoming corporation; GARY L. PALMER; WILLIAM IRVINE; and ROBERT E. DELINE

Case Heading (S-08-0035)
Case Number:S-08-0035Case Docketed On:02/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:GOB, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. RAINBOW CANYON, INC., a Wyoming corporation; GARY L. PALMER; WILLIAM IRVINE; and ROBERT E. DELINE
Full Title:GOB, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. RAINBOW CANYON, INC., a Wyoming corporation; GARY L. PALMER; WILLIAM IRVINE; and ROBERT E. DELINE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGOB, LLC a Wyoming limited liability companySteven F. Freudenthal
AppelleeRainbow Canyon, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJoel M. Vincent
AppelleeGary L. PalmerJoel M. Vincent
AppelleeWilliam IrvineJoel M. Vincent
AppelleeThomas C. DelineJoel M. Vincent
AppelleeRobert E. DelineJoel M. Vincent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 157
Citation:197 P.3d 1269

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/28/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/28/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/11/2008Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/20/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/20/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/16/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
06/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/07/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-V, Original Papers; Volume VI, Exhibits; Volume VII, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joel Vincent for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Steven Freudenthal for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Steven F. Freudenthal for the appellant and Joel M. Vincent for the appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/29/2008Notice-Internal - Other - Thomas C. Deline removed from captionNotice-InternalOtherFinal
12/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal