judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY Q. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1199
Short Caption:ANTHONY Q. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5971-10Filed Date:09/22/2010

Opening Event Date:09/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony ParkerY
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.YN
AppelleeTested StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Heather L. Carlton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire
10/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/19/2010RECEIVED - motion for transcript.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (88 pgs/Walker) 6/28/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (89-187 pgs/Walker) 6/29/10 proc
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (330 pgs/Walker) 6/30/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (80 pgs/Geddes) 7/1/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (36 pgs/Walker) 7/6/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (9 pgs/tape) 9/21/10 proc. w/cd
12/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY pending 23-110 no oppo
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
04/18/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief & appendix
05/05/2011ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant and the limited appendix. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. F/O that appellant's motion to stay is denied as moot. (ETW)
05/05/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/05/2011APPENDIX (attached to the Brief of Appellant)
06/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/08/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo-MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION-of denial of unopposed motion to stay appeal pending counsel's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct defendant's sentence and judgment pursuant to d.c. code 23-110 and request for hearing
09/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/09/2011FiledAffirmed
10/03/2011FiledMandate