judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLARENCE H. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1218
Short Caption:CLARENCE H. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Lead: 09-CF-1179 Consolidated:10-CO-1218
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-27124-08Filed Date:09/24/2010

Opening Event Date:09/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClarence H. Smith Y
R. Michael LaBelleNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CF-1179 and 10-CO-1218 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Robert M. LaBelle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1218 nunc pro tunc to September 27, 2010. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies for appeal no. 10-CO-1218 to this court forthwith. F/O that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appelee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. 31. (ETW)
11/03/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1218)
11/03/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1218)
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/23/10. no oppo
12/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 23, 2010. (JAC)
12/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 1/12/11 no oppo
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 12, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/11/2011APPENDIX
02/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 11, 2011 (no oppo)
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 11, 2011. (JAC)
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/15/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - to file reply brief (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave of appellant.
07/21/2011FiledReply Brief of appellant. (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Newman
03/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate and Newman, Senior Judge.)
04/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
04/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's moton for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing en banc to 5/3/12
05/02/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
06/26/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or reheraing en banc.
07/05/2012FiledMandate
09/05/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)